6
Report on the Civil Veterinary Department,
Punjab, for the year 1917-18
By COLONEL J. FARMER, C.I.E., CHIEF SUPERINTENDENT.
Part I.—Administration
1. The following statement shows the names of the officers who
held charge of the several appointments and the amount of touring perform-
ed by them:—
Name of appointment. |
Name of officer. |
Date of holding charge. |
Number of days |
NUMBER OF |
|
By rail. |
By road. |
||||
Chief Superintendent, Civil Ve- |
Colonel J. Farmer, |
1st April 1917 to 31st March 1918 |
204 |
5,953 |
2,617 |
Superintendent, Civil Veterinary |
Mr. D. Meadows ... |
1st April to 18th April 1917 |
5 |
187 |
119 |
Officiating Superintendent, |
Mr. T. F. Quirke ... |
19th April 1917 to 31st March |
108 |
9,188 |
907 |
Superintendent, Civil Veterinary |
Mr. Q. Taylor ... |
1st April to 25th May 1917 and |
128 |
5,591 |
627 |
Officiating Superintendent, |
Lala Kotu Ram ... |
26th May 1917 to 25th July 1917 |
42 |
3,390 |
818 |
Deputy Superintendent, South |
Ditto |
1st April 1917 to 25th May 1917 |
237 |
9,840 |
1,829 |
Officer under training ... |
MY. J.S. Garewal ... |
30th January 1918 to 31st March |
12 |
530 |
156 |
The services of Mr. Meadows were placed at the disposal of the
Government of India in the Army Department,—vide Punjab Government
notification No. 184 S. R., dated 19th May 1917. Consequently the appoint-
ment of the Superintendent, Civil Veterinary Department, North-West Fron-
tier Province and North Punjab, was held by Mr. Quirke from 19th April 1917
to 31st March 1918.
Mr. Taylor was on sick leave from 26th May 1917 to 25th July 1917,
during which period Lala Kotu Ram, Deputy Superintendent, held the appoint-
ment of the Superintendent, Civil Veterinary Department, South Punjab.
2. Owing to the shortage of officers on account of War the Superinten-
dent, North Punjab, is still in charge of the Civil Veterinary Department
Administration of the North-West Frontier Province.
The Chief Superintendent, Superintendents and the Deputy Superintend
dent toured in all the districts of their respective circles except Karnal and
Kulu in connection with horse and cattle breeding, investigation of contagious
diseases and for the inspection of veterinary hospitals, etc.
The Chief Superintendent inspected the following hospitals outside his
own circle :—
Simla, Ferozepore, Ludhiana, Hissar, Lyallpur, Beri, Rohtak, Gujrat,
Jhelum, Gujar Khan, Rawalpindi, Murree and Kohala.
At the request of the Postmaster-General he inspected the ponies work-
ing on the tonga line between Murree and Srinagar.
This department assisted the Army Remount Department in dealing
with contagious equine diseases in selected districts.
3. The system of instructing Veterinary Inspectors and Veterinary
Assistants was carried out as in previous years.